U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00425
  • Case Name: Peavey v. Idaho Title Loans Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 01, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 04, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Litigation Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2019: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • February 05, 2019: [Consent Filed]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 25, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 23, 2019: [Entry of Default]
  • January 23, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 04, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • November 30, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 02, 2018: [Status Report]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • October 03, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.