U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00426
  • Case Name: Morozko v. Shoshone County Sheriff's Office et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 03, 2019: [Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Return Mail]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Order]
  • March 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Supplement]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Supplement]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Supplement]
  • December 09, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 04, 2018: [Supplement]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 20, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 13, 2018: [Supplement]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • October 16, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 16, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 04, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 04, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.