U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00429
  • Case Name: Hiatt v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • February 25, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • February 01, 2019: [Administrative Record]
  • February 01, 2019: [Answer to Petition for Review]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • December 12, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • December 06, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 01, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 09, 2018: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • October 09, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 06, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 06, 2018: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • October 06, 2018: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.