U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00430
  • Case Name: Fraga-Jimenez v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 11, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 10, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2020: [Errata]
  • April 01, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 16, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 04, 2019: [Administrative Record]
  • February 04, 2019: [Answer to Petition for Review]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 24, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 15, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 15, 2018: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • October 09, 2018: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • October 09, 2018: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.