U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00423
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Holm et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Costs Taxed]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order of Sale]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order of Sale]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 10, 2019: [Judgment - Default]
  • April 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Default Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • December 12, 2018: [Entry of Default]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 02, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.