U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00424
  • Case Name: KB Fabrication and Welding, LLC v. Pacific Hide & Fur Depot
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Discovery Plan]
  • February 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 20, 2020: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order]
  • February 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Summons Issued]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Consents (All are in)]
  • April 17, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 16, 2019: [Third Party Complaint]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 08, 2019: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • February 14, 2019: [Third Party Complaint]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order]
  • February 07, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 06, 2019: [Stipulation]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 21, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 21, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 13, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 13, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 01, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 15, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 10, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 09, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 09, 2018: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 09, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 09, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • October 09, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.