U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00431
  • Case Name: Groat v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • May 04, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 27, 2019: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 19, 2019: [Reminder Notice-Not All Consents Are Filed]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Consent Filed]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • April 03, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Administrative Record]
  • February 05, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 12, 2018: [Errata]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • October 15, 2018: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • October 15, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 15, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 09, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.