U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00433
  • Case Name: DeKlotz et al v. Sanofi-Aventis et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 10, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 03, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order]
  • May 03, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2019: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 14, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 04, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 07, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 06, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • November 05, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order]
  • October 18, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 16, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 16, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 16, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 16, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 15, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • October 09, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.