U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00437
  • Case Name: Salinas v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • April 04, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Administrative Record]
  • February 04, 2019: [Answer to Petition for Review]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2019: [Stay]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • December 12, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • December 06, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 01, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 12, 2018: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • October 12, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 10, 2018: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • October 10, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 10, 2018: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.