U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00438
  • Case Name: Lete v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 22, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 31, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Statement]
  • June 28, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Stipulation]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 09, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 15, 2018: [Supplement]
  • October 12, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • October 12, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • October 12, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 10, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.