U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00441
  • Case Name: Weaver v. Menard et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2020: [Response to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice of Substitution]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 11, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 10, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Receipt]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 23, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 23, 2020: [Letter]
  • January 09, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • August 15, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Joinder]
  • July 30, 2019: [Letter]
  • July 29, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 23, 2019: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 10, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 14, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 05, 2019: [Consent Filed]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 23, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 15, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 14, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 13, 2019: [Clarify]
  • May 10, 2019: [Clarify]
  • May 02, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 16, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 11, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 11, 2018: [Complaint]
  • October 11, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.