U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00469
  • Case Name: Ferguson et al v. State of Idaho Department of Transportation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 13, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 09, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 05, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 27, 2020: [Strike]
  • January 08, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Declaration]
  • December 27, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 27, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 23, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 24, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
  • July 24, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 23, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 10, 2019: [Status Conference]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 18, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 11, 2019: [Consent Filed]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 07, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 26, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • February 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 07, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • February 05, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 05, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Affidavit of Service]
  • January 22, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2019: [Summons Issued]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Status Report]
  • November 12, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 12, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 29, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 24, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 24, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.