U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00503
  • Case Name: Gant v. Idaho Veteran's Network et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Letter]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Supplement]
  • May 06, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • April 01, 2019: [Supplement]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Order]
  • March 21, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2019: [Supplement]
  • March 07, 2019: [Supplement]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Supplement]
  • February 05, 2019: [Supplement]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Supplement]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 14, 2018: [Complaint]
  • November 14, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.