U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00507
  • Case Name: Ward v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 28, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 28, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 28, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order]
  • January 08, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 07, 2019: [Declaration]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • December 27, 2018: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • December 27, 2018: [Clarify]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • November 20, 2018: [Complaint]
  • November 20, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • November 20, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.