U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00527
  • Case Name: Mead et al v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 20, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 07, 2019: [Consent Filed]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 02, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 30, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 19, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • November 21, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.