U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00537
  • Case Name: Jackson v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Stipulation]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 04, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • December 10, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 05, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 05, 2018: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • December 05, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.