U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00524
  • Case Name: Coy v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Return Mail]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • June 11, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • June 03, 2019: [Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • May 16, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 16, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Lis Pendens]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 07, 2019: [Summons Issued]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Receipt]
  • December 06, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.