U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00521
  • Case Name: P. R., a minor by her natural parent and guardian, S.R., Plaintiff, v. Shoshone School District No. 321, a public entity of the State of Idaho, Defendant
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Return of Exhibits]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Return of Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [~Util - Sealed Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 10, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 07, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • May 07, 2019: [Seal]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 24, 2019: [Jury Notes]
  • April 24, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 23, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 23, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • April 19, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • April 19, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • April 17, 2019: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • April 17, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2019: [Jury Selection (sealed)]
  • April 17, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 15, 2019: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 14, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 12, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 12, 2019: [Errata]
  • April 12, 2019: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 12, 2019: [Supplement]
  • April 10, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 09, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Objection]
  • April 08, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 04, 2019: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 01, 2019: [Proposed Special Verdict]
  • April 01, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 01, 2019: [Witness List]
  • April 01, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 01, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 01, 2019: [Trial Brief]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.