U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00111
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Bland
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 20, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 16, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • July 12, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Default Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • April 04, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.