U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Khurana v. State of Idaho, Child Support Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Supplement]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Appellants Brief]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 21, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 17, 2019: [Waive]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Certificate of Readiness]
  • May 23, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 23, 2019: [Supplement]
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Filing BK Appeal]
  • April 09, 2019: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.