U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00120
  • Case Name: Ullrich v. Idaho Board of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Supplement]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Letter]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Discovery]
  • April 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2019: [Complaint]
  • April 10, 2019: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • April 10, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.