U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00125
  • Case Name: Horizon Tower Limited Partnership-II et al v. Ada County, Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Judgment - Consent]
  • November 07, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 07, 2019: [Entry of Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 30, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 28, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Litigation Order]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 16, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 16, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 16, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.