U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00133
  • Case Name: Resort Aviation Services, Inc. v. Kootenai County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Compel]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Stipulation]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 19, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
  • June 11, 2019: [Consent Filed]
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 05, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 17, 2019: [Litigation Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • April 17, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.