U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00134
  • Case Name: Sharbrough v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Reply (generic)]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 23, 2019: [Declaration]
  • December 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 06, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • November 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 17, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Administrative Record]
  • August 14, 2019: [Answer to Petition for Review]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Consents (All are in)]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Consent Filed]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 05, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • April 18, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 18, 2019: [Petition for Review]
  • April 18, 2019: [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.