U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00170
  • Case Name: Van Hook et al v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [USCA Order]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 26, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2019: [Joinder]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2019: [Declaration]
  • October 28, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • October 28, 2019: [Entry of Default]
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 15, 2019: [Affidavit]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2019: [Joinder]
  • August 22, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 16, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 06, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • August 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 23, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • July 23, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 23, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 17, 2019: [Affidavit of Service]
  • July 12, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • June 06, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • June 06, 2019: [Quash]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 31, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 30, 2019: [Quash]
  • May 09, 2019: [Receipt]
  • May 09, 2019: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • May 09, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.