U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00165
  • Case Name: Stoltzfus et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 20, 2020: [Status Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 12, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • November 06, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 06, 2019: [Status Report]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [Consent Filed]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 18, 2019: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • September 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 19, 2019: [Declaration]
  • August 19, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Seal]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • June 05, 2019: [Summons Issued as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.