open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00210
    Party Name:Jewelers Mutual Insurance Company v. Valley Vending & Coffee Services, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Memorandum]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Default]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent Filed]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Case Number Change]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43840
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =