open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Idaho

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:19-40557-
    Party Name:Brian Walter Lawrence
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch.7/13 Income Tax Turnover Order]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Income Tax Turnover Order]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?160828
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =