open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:19-40558-
    Party Name:Saesha M Daley
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case (No Asset)]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Automatic Discharge of Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch.7/13 Income Tax Turnover Order]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Income Tax Turnover Order]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?160832
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =