open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00212
    Party Name:Roland et al v. Alta Mesa Resources, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Case Number Change]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent Filed]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43842
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =