open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00213
    Party Name:Byerly v. Shedd et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Case Number Change]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consents (All are in)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent Filed]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Conditional Filing]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43843
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =