open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00211
    Party Name:Dreyer et al v. Idaho Department of Health and Welfare et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43841
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =