U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00224
  • Case Name: Shockey et al v. Advantage Financial Services, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2020: [Response to Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Sanctions]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • January 13, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 13, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 10, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 08, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 18, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 23, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 23, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 02, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 02, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 02, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 02, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • June 19, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.