U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00245
  • Case Name: Wildlands Defense et al v. Bolling et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 01, 2020: [Response to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 11, 2020: [Supplement]
  • April 10, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Supplement]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 31, 2019: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 10, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Consent Filed]
  • September 16, 2019: [Litigation Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 03, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 30, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 02, 2019: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 02, 2019: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 01, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.