U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00274
  • Case Name: Sather v. 5th District, Twin Falls the State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2019: [Letter]
  • December 05, 2019: [Letter]
  • December 05, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 22, 2019: [Letter]
  • October 15, 2019: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [Letter]
  • October 08, 2019: [Letter]
  • October 03, 2019: [Letter]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Letter]
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 13, 2019: [Letter]
  • September 09, 2019: [Consent Filed]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Letter]
  • August 13, 2019: [Letter]
  • August 01, 2019: [Letter]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Receipt]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • July 12, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 12, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • July 12, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.