open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:19-40753-
    Party Name:Matthew Steven Dugan and Demi Camille Dugan
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Employ (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Turnover]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stipulated Order]
    Date Published:November 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Stipulated Order]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Assets]
    Date Published:October 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Objection]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:August 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch.7/13 Income Tax Turnover Order]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Income Tax Turnover Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?161454
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =