open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:19-40752-
    Party Name:Joseph Paul Storer
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case (No Asset)]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Automatic Discharge of Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch.7/13 Income Tax Turnover Order]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Income Tax Turnover Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?161453
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =