open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00310
    Party Name:Wheeler v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Administrative Record]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Petition for Review]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consents (All are in)]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent Filed]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Procedural Order (SS)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Review]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?44162
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =