open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00311
    Party Name:Wilkins-Smithson et al v. City of Coeur d'Alene et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent Filed]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?44165
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =