open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:19-06054-
    Party Name:Rainsdon v. Larsen et al
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Recusal (No Motion)]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Court's Certificate of Service of Certified Document]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Lis Pendens]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?161533
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =