open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00320
    Party Name:Dillon v. USA
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (generic)]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?44229
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =