open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00287-1
    Party Name:USA v. Hernandez-Hernandez
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Entry Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Procedural Order - Docket Text]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Minute Entry]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detain]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?44397
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =