open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00284-1
    Party Name:USA v. Torres-Cano
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Recommendation]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Procedural Order - Docket Text]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Entry Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detain]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?44391
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =