open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00292-1
    Party Name:USA v. Laney
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Handwriting Exemplars]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Handwriting Exemplars]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Issue Subpoenas]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Issue Subpoenas]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certificate of Service ]
    Date Published:November 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Corrective Entry - Sealed]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Response ]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bill of Particulars]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Procedural Order - Docket Text]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment - Docket Text]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Passport Surrender/Return]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?44387
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =