open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00290-1
    Party Name:USA v. Pravorne
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:December 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Procedural Order - Docket Text]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Entry Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment - Docket Text]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detain]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?44379
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =