open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00442
    Party Name:Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois v. Brasscraft Manufacturing Company et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consents (All are in)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent Filed]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?44782
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =