open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00346-1
    Party Name:USA v. Naylor
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Recommendation]
    Date Published:April 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection/Response/Reply to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:April 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:April 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendation of Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver, District Judge to take plea]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Entry Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Procedural Order - Docket Text]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?44784
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =