open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00345-1
    Party Name:USA v. Golden
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Service by Publication]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document - Sentencing Support Letters]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Recommendation]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver, District Judge to take plea]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Entry Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Procedural Order - Docket Text]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detain]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?44779
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =