open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00347-1
    Party Name:USA v. De La Cruz-Perez
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty-Immigration]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Procedural Order - Docket Text]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Entry Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment - Docket Text]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detain]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?44777
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =