open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00356-1
    Party Name:USA v. Dennis
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detain]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?44775
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =